+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- ED (ref Bill) adopted
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
March 8, 2018: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 8, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 8, 2018: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 12
March 5, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 30, 2018: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2018: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor