+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Discussed and held
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
1444approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1