+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Proposed Amendment
Public Safety, Military and Technology
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
February 9, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6