+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:01PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- RULES (ref COMPS) adopted
- COMPS (ref Bill) adopted
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 22, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
March 1, 2018: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 1, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 27, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 30, 2018: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor