+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 328
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- House adopts conference committee
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts conference committee
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- House appointed: Mesnard, Farley, Vogt
- Recommendation: that the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Conference committee recommended
- Senate appointed: Yarbrough, Aboud, Mccomish
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard
On March 29, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
- House second read
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN) (sub Gould flr amend)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (13)
Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN) (sub Gould flr amend) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Mesnard Floor Amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Yarbrough flr amend (ref FIN) (sub Gould flr amend) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-5 fin_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
May 3, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 3, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
March 6, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 6, 2012: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
January 31, 2012: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1