+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Barto flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS) adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (6)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health
House Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
May 7, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 6
May 7, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 54
March 1, 2016: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
February 1, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 1, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor