+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:06 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Reform and Human Services: Do pass
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Reform and Human Services
- House first read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2013: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2013: Reform and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2013: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor