+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GOV (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Gould flr amend (ref Bill)
- COW motion
- Sen aboud to show the bill failed to pass
- Third read: Passed
- Motion
- Senator melvin motion to reconsider whereby the Senate passed sb 1442 on third reading on june 25, 2009. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Substituted House bill on third reading
On June 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass amended
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Government Institutions
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Institutions
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
June 8, 2009: Government Institutions: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2