+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- BI
- SUB Floor Amend to BI to Bill - Finchem - passed
- Floor Amend to Bill - Andrade - withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- House Banking and Insurance Committee: do pass amended.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Banking and Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Lesko flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
April 11, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
April 10, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 3
March 8, 2017: House Banking and Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
March 8, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
March 6, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
January 31, 2017: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2