+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1441approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
June 4, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor