+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:06 pmobject
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Rfeir action sections
- Y passed
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Yee #1 flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS)
- Amendment adopted: Yee #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Yee #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yee #1 flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yee #2 flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Yee #1 flr amend (ref Bill) (sub HHS) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2013: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2013: Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
March 5, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2013: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor