+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (49)
On May 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Conference engrossed version
- Chapter: 327
- Action: Signed
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
On April 30, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Conference committee
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
On April 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
- Conference committee
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference committee
- Conference committee recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Amendment passed: MAPS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- House first read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Gould flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Conference Committee
Conference Adopted Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Proposed Amendment
Military Affairs and Public Safety
House Adopted Amendment
Gould flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-22 gr_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
6-22 gr_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
2-13 gr-approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2012: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
April 30, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
March 22, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
March 19, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 14, 2012: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor