+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting third reading
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
2-19 fin-corrected
Senate Fact Sheet
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-25 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
February 7, 2008: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor