+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 3, 2015: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor