+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 12 18 0 0 y failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator klein motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb 1433 on third reading on march 2, 2011. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading on reconsideration
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Klein flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Aboud flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (3)
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Proposed Amendment
Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
Senate Proposed Amendment
Klein flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2011: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 18
February 1, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2