+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On June 19, 2008 in the House:
- Com
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
- Natural Resources and Public Safety: Withdrawn
On April 7, 2008 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On April 3, 2008 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Public Safety
- House first read
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:25 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Higher Education: Do pass
On February 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (3)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
2-15 hed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 27, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 7, 2008: Higher Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1