+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Pshs
- Rules
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Final disposition: Held in committees
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1433PSHS
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
June 4, 2009: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7