+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Insurance Committee: do pass.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Insurance Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
- Second read in Senate.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (10)
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 10
February 8, 2016: House Insurance Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 8, 2016: Insurance: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 8, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 4, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
February 2, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
February 2, 2016: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor