+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On July 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 31
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 24, 2009 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: VMA (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: RULES (ref VMA)
- Amendment adopted: Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) (sub VMA)
- Third read: Passed
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass amended
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Veterans and Military Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Veterans and Military Affairs - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-15 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-8 vma
Senate Fact Sheet
1429vma_as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Present/NV: 10
June 22, 2009: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
June 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 18, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
June 4, 2009: Veterans and Military Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7