+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 243
- Action: Signed
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 4:37 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment adopted: Lopez flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: ED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (12)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Lopez flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Lopez flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-26 ed-hhs_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-25 ed-hhs_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 13, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2013: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2013: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
February 5, 2013: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor