+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On March 16, 2023 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:21PM.
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
March 16, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 1, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 1, 2023: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7