+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: JUD - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to JUD - Kern
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Judiciary
Senate Proposed Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Judiciary
Senate Adopted Amendment
Judiciary - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to JUD - Kern - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
March 12, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 4, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
February 3, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor