+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 238
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On March 15, 2011 in the House:
- Government: Do pass
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Do pass and proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:45 pm
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (6)
April 14, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2011: Government: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2011: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
February 1, 2011: Rules: Do pass and proper for consideration (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor