+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Griffin flr amend (ref APPROP) adopted
- RULES (ref APPROP) withdrawn
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
March 2, 2017: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 2, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 31, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor