+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pmobject
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-10 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 11, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 11, 2014: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 5, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor