+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote detail 12 17 1 0 failed
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion
- Senator shooter motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass sb 1411 on third reading on march 1, 2011. motion carried.
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading on reconsideration
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Failed
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Gallardo #1 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo #2 flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo #3 flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 9:55 amobject
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-14 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2011: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1