+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Jud
- Rules
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Smith flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-8 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
3-28 gr_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
January 31, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor