+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Smith flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 9:55 amobject
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Smith flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor