+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Senate concurred.
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Transmit to Senate.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Bowers - passed
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: withdrawn.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (6)
May 26, 2021: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
May 26, 2021: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
March 16, 2021: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
March 16, 2021: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 18, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 27, 2021: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor