+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Failed
- Final disposition: Failed in Senate on third reading
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Withdrawn
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-21 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 17, 2011: Third read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
February 17, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor