+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
On June 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
On June 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 28, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On May 27, 2008 in the House:
- Amendment passed: RULES
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On May 20, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 20, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Bee flr amend (ref CED)
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Bee Floor Amendment; reference to CED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Bee Floor Amendment; reference to CED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
2-29ced_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
7-16 as vetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-25 ced strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
5-29 housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
3-21 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 26, 2008: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
May 28, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
March 27, 2008: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 27, 2008: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
March 20, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 18, 2008: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor