+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 309
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 18, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: APPROP
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to APPROP - Jones
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 2, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Gallardo flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Jones Substitute Floor Amendment to the Appropriations Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Adopted Amendment
Jones Substitute Floor Amendment to the Appropriations Committee Amendment; reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-19 bsfss_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 19, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
April 18, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 2, 2011: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2