+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:39PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 27, 2021: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor