+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:47 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Hobbs flr amend (ref APPROP) (sub RULES)
- Third read: Passed
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Hobbs flr amend (ref APPROP) (sub RULES) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2013: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 13, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 12, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 21, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor