+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 182
- Action: Signed
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Yee flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: HHS (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Proposed Amendment
Yee flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 25, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
March 9, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 3, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
February 11, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor