+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in House
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass amended
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment withdrawn: NRT (ref Bill)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (14)
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Adopted Amendment
2-3 nrt
Senate Fact Sheet
3-2 nrt_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Transportation
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2011: Agriculture and Water: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
March 3, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
March 3, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2011: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2011: Natural Resources and Transportation: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor