+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations: Held
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Commerce amd Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
February 3, 2015: Commerce amd Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
February 3, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor