+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 23
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 22, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 21, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:30 pmobject
On March 8, 2011 in the House:
- Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Employment and Regulatory Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CE (ref Bill)
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (7)
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Energy - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-14 ce_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
2-18 ce_strikermemo_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-7 ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 4, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2011: Employment and Regulatory Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 4
February 28, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2011: Commerce and Energy: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor