+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:12PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:22PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (4)
March 18, 2019: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 18, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 4, 2019: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor