+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe - withdrawn
- Floor Amend to Bill - McCune Davis #2 - failed
- Floor Amend to Bill - McCune Davis #1 - failed
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (10)
May 5, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
May 5, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 39
March 1, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
March 1, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 22, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
February 22, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
February 1, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
February 1, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor