+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 195
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 22, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 4:40 pmobject
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: VMGA (ref Bill)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Veterans, Military and Government Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 27, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 1, 2012: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 30, 2012: Veterans, Military and Government Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor