+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 22, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 74
- Action: Signed
On April 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 15, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2008 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 26, 2008 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass
On March 24, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 20, 2008 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 13, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:38 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Education K-12: Withdrawn
On February 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate second read
On February 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-29 approp
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 15, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 2
March 20, 2008: Education (K-12): Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 13, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2008: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor