+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Failed in committee of whole
- Committee of the Whole: Failed to pass
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Banking and Insurance: Do pass
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Banking and Insurance
- Senate first read
+ − Vote
January 31, 2011: Banking and Insurance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1