+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Vote
June 4, 2009: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2