+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:15PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
February 20, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 31, 2017: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor