+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Ways & Means Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:39PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
January 27, 2021: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor