+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 253
- Action: Signed
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole:
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: SUB Floor Amend to COM - Shope
- Amendment substituted: COM
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: McComish flr amend (ref CEM)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref CEM)
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (15)
Shope SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Gowan SIT COW Floor Amendment; Reference to House engrossed Senate bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref CEM) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Shope SUBSTITUTE Floor amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment; Reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
McComish flr amend (ref CEM) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 23, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
March 5, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 4, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor