+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Transmit to Governor.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- SUB Floor Amend to JPS - Farnsworth - passed
- JPS
- Floor Amend to Bill - Townsend - passed
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Barto flr amend (ref HHS) adopted
- RULES (ref HHS) adopted
- HHS (ref Bill) adopted
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (6)
April 9, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
April 4, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
March 5, 2018: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
March 1, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
January 29, 2018: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor