+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senator Gorman motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1395 on Final reading on June 29, 2009 and immediately vote. Motion carried.: Failed in senate on final reading on reconsideration
- Motion
- Vote detail 14 15 1 0 failed
- Senate final read: Failed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Meyer
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
On June 15, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass amended
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Senate second read
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (9)
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Meyer Floor amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Meyer Floor amendment, reference to Senate engrossed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-11 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
6-29 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
1395ED
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2009: Senate final read: failed (Senate)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 9
June 16, 2009: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 2
June 16, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 15, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 2
June 4, 2009: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor