+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- House first read
On March 25, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Senate second read
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 4, 2010: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3